IL HB5085 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Agricultural Areas Conservation and Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
AGRICULTURE-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 81 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1072 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 081-034-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-028-000 |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-004-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-04-03 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 005-010-000 |
2014-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-03-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |