IL HB5085 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Enrolled on November 30 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on November 30 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, Counties Code, Illinois Municipal Code, School Code, Illinois Insurance Code, Health Maintenance Organization Act, and Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Provides that accident and health insurance policies that provide coverage for prescription drugs or cancer chemotherapy treatment must provide coverage for prescribed orally-administered cancer medication used to kill or slow the growth of cancerous cells. Provides that an insurer shall ensure that the financial requirements and treatment limitations for orally-administered cancer medication coverage are no more restrictive than the requirements and limitations applied to intravenously administered cancer medications. Provides that accident and health insurance policies shall provide coverage to a qualified individual for participation in a qualified clinical cancer trial. Provides that an insurer shall not deny, limit, or impose additional conditions on the coverage of routine patient costs. Provides that the payment rate shall be at the agreed rate for covered items and services provided by a participating provider and at the usual and customary rate for covered items and services provided by a nonparticipating provider. Makes other changes. Contains a nonacceleration clause. Effective immediately.
Title
INS-CANCER-DRUG-CLINIC TRIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-11-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-11-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2010-11-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-11-30 | House Concurs 113-001-000 | |
2010-11-30 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 023-000-000 | |
2010-11-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee | |
2010-11-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-11-29 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-11-29 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-06-27 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Insurance Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Greg Harris | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-05-06 | Arrived in House | |
2010-05-06 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. David Koehler | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler | |
2010-05-06 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-04-22 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Insurance | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-04-06 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2010-04-06 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-04-06 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-04-06 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee | |
2010-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-09 | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 | |
2010-03-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2010-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2010-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2010-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2010-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-02-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading | |
2010-01-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |