IL HB5082 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2,000,000 to the Department of Commerce and Opportunity from the General Revenue Fund for the implementation of information technology and staffing provisions under the Business Assistance and Regulatory Reform Act. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DCEO-INFO TECHNOLOGY-STAFFING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5082&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB5082.pdf |