IL HB5080 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit for taxpayers who, for at least 27 weeks during the taxable year, employ a disabled individual. Sets forth the amount of the credit based on the average number of hours per week that the disabled individual worked. Provides that the credit may not be carried forward or back and may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero. Requires the Department of Revenue, in cooperation with the Department of Human Services, to adopt rules concerning the credit, including criteria for designating an employee as a "disabled individual". Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-DISABLED EMPLYEE CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-03-08 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5080&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5080.htm |