IL HB5074 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department of Human Services and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services (Departments) shall increase by 20% rates and reimbursements in effect on June 30, 2020 for community-based providers of services for persons with developmental disabilities and for ID/DD facilities and MC/DD facilities. Requires community-based providers, ID/DD facilities, and MC/DD facilities to use at least 75% of the amount of the rate increase to increase the wages and benefits paid to their staff. Requires the Departments to ensure wage rate components are at least 145% of the statewide, regional, or local minimum wage rate, whichever is higher, as determined by the Departments. Requires community-based providers of services for persons with developmental disabilities, ID/DD facilities, and MC/DD facilities to certify compliance with the provisions of the amendatory Act in a form and manner prescribed by the Departments. Requires the Departments to adopt emergency rules to implement the provisions of the amendatory Act. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Grants the Departments emergency rulemaking authority. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-DHFS-RATE INCREASES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5074&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5074.htm |