IL HB5070 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Telehealth Act. Includes clinicians licensed to provide medical services under Illinois law in the definition of "health care professional".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TELEHEALTH-DEFINITION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-27HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0644
2018-07-27HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-07-27HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-001-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2251505Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback