IL HB5067 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Private Business and Vocational Schools Act of 2012, the Private College Act, and the Academic Degree Act. Defines "religious institution" in these Acts. Provides that any religious institution (instead of any institution devoted entirely to the teaching of religion or theology) shall not be considered to be a private business and vocational school; makes related changes. Provides that no religious institution shall be subject to the educational requirements, standards, or demands contained in the Private College Act or the Academic Degree Act or in those Acts' administrative rules, and requires a religious institution to notify each of its students in writing that the religious degree being earned or course work earned at a religious, non-accredited, post-secondary educational institution may not transfer to other institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHR ED-RELIGIOUS INSTITUTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-15HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Higher Education Committee; 006-010-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-007-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10542615Amended CodeCitation Text
10542620Amended CodeCitation Text
10542630Amended CodeCitation Text
11010051.5New CodeSee Bill Text
110101011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback