IL HB5066 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to make certain real estate conveyances in Bureau County, Menard County, and Pulaski County, subject to specified conditions. Authorizes the Department of Transportation to make certain real estate conveyances in Grundy County, DuPage County, DeKalb County, Montgomery County, Tazewell County, and Mason County, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT/DNR: LAND TRANSFER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5066&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5066.htm |