IL HB5063 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2018, an individual who has not been entitled to teach in this State by an Illinois-approved educator preparation program and obtains an educator license under the Code may apply for a refund of the required application fee after 12 months of issuance and shall be issued a refund from the State Board of Education if the individual provides evidence that he or she has taught at a school district for at least 12 months. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-APPLICATION-REFUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-40Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback