IL HB5062 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, the State Board of Education shall develop and maintain a program aimed at facilitating education in advanced manufacturing technical skills. Provides that the program shall be implemented in no less than 12 public high schools, over the span of 3 years, where the youth unemployment rate is at least twice the national average. Specifies program requirements. Provides that the State Board shall ensure that each high school participating in the program has adequate funding for at least one industry coordinator, tutoring, pre-employment and on-the-job mentoring, professional and leadership development, and life and financial management instruction. Provides that the State Board shall use a program provider to help design, build, and accredit the training program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TECHNICAL SKILLS PROGRM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Education
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-031-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-001-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback