IL HB5058 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a person shall not knowingly and without authority remove, destroy, tamper with, damage, alter, disable, or otherwise interfere with or circumvent the operation of an approved electronic monitoring device or knowingly interfere or tamper with, or circumvent or alter, a signal, impulse, or data that is being transmitted by or stored within an approved electronic monitoring device worn or otherwise used by an individual as a condition of: (1) pretrial or pre-adjudicatory detention; (2) probation; (3) conditional discharge; (4) periodic imprisonment; (5) parole, aftercare release, or mandatory supervised release; (6) work release; (7) furlough; or 8) post-trial incarceration. Provides exceptions. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony.
Title
CD CORR-ELECTRONIC MONITORING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-8A-4.1-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5058&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5058.htm |