IL HB5057 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Director of State Police may also authorize any civilian employee of the Department of State Police who is not a State policeman to be a truck weighing inspector with the power of enforcing a provision of the Illinois Vehicle Code which allows upon application and good cause for the issuing of a special permit authorizing the applicant to operate or move a vehicle or combination of vehicles of a size or weight of vehicle or load exceeding the maximum permitted or otherwise not in conformity with the Illinois Vehicle Code upon any highway under the jurisdiction of the party granting the permit. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person, firm, or corporation convicted of a violation for a permit issued for excess size and weight for the third offense by the same person, firm, or corporation within a period of one year after the date of the first offense, not less than $300 nor more than $500 and the Department of State Police may not issue permits to the person, firm, or corporation convicted of a third offense during a period of one year after the date of conviction or supervision for such third offense, unless the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident causing damage to property, injury, or death to a person. Provides that if the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident of damage to property, injury, or death to a person, the person, firm, or corporation shall not be issued a permit for one year after the date of conviction or supervision for the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-TRUCK INSPECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConnaughay
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-03-02HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261018Amended CodeCitation Text
625515-301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback