IL HB5057 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0830
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0830
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Director of State Police may also authorize any civilian employee of the Department of State Police who is not a State policeman to be a truck weighing inspector with the power of enforcing a provision of the Illinois Vehicle Code which allows upon application and good cause for the issuing of a special permit authorizing the applicant to operate or move a vehicle or combination of vehicles of a size or weight of vehicle or load exceeding the maximum permitted or otherwise not in conformity with the Illinois Vehicle Code upon any highway under the jurisdiction of the party granting the permit. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person, firm, or corporation convicted of a violation for a permit issued for excess size and weight for the third offense by the same person, firm, or corporation within a period of one year after the date of the first offense, not less than $300 nor more than $500 and the Department of State Police may not issue permits to the person, firm, or corporation convicted of a third offense during a period of one year after the date of conviction or supervision for such third offense, unless the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident causing damage to property, injury, or death to a person. Provides that if the violation is the cause or contributing cause in a motor vehicle accident of damage to property, injury, or death to a person, the person, firm, or corporation shall not be issued a permit for one year after the date of conviction or supervision for the offense.
Title
STATE POLICE-TRUCK INSPECTION
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] |
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0830 |
2018-08-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConnaughay |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |