IL HB5056 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0956
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0956
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "road machine". Provides that the owner of a junk vehicle is not required to surrender the vehicle's certificate of title under certain circumstances. Provides that the Secretary of State may use alternating numeric and alphabetical characters when issuing a special registration plate. Provides that a permanent vehicle registration plate shall be issued for a one-time fee of $8 to certain types of buses operating within a municipality. Provides that any vehicle with a permanent vehicle registration plate owned or operated by a public school district from grades K-12, a public community college, or a medical facility or hospital is exempt from any fee for the transfer of registration. Provides that the Secretary shall notify the State Police or the Secretary of State Department of Police if an application for a certificate of title or registration of a vehicle is received and the vehicle has been reported stolen or converted. Provides that the Secretary of State Department of Police shall conduct an investigation concerning the identity of the registered owner of the vehicle. Allows the Secretary of State Department of Police to restore, restamp, or reaffix a vehicle identification number plate or affix a new plate bearing the original manufacturer's vehicle identification number. Provides that a new or used vehicle dealer cannot issue any other person a newly created key to a vehicle without a color photocopy or electronic scan of the driver's license or identification card. Provides that for certain recyclable metals, a scrap processor shall obtain a color photocopy or electronic scan of the driver's license or identification card. Repeals a provision providing for 2-year registration period for buses operating within a municipality. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] |
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0956 |
2018-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-177.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-117.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-405.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-804.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-807 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-808.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 4-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 5-401.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |