IL HB5048 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FY19 Department of Transportation Capital Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$IDOT CAPITAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-06HouseTo Motor Fuel Analysis Subcommittee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback