IL HB5047 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Presumptively Void Transfers Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Includes a civil union partner within the scope of the term "family member" and includes a transfer on death instrument within the scope of the term "transfer instrument". Makes changes regarding the rebuttable presumption that a transfer instrument is void if the transferee is a caregiver and the fair market value of the transferred property exceeds $20,000. Provides that if the property in question is an interest in real property, a bona fide purchaser or mortgagee for value shall take the subject property free and clear of the action challenging the transfer instrument if the transfer to the bona fide purchaser or mortgagee for value occurs prior to the recordation of a lis pendens for an action challenging the transfer. Sets forth conditions under which a financial institution or similar entity is not liable for distributing or releasing property when the transfer is challenged. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROBATE ACT TRANSFER CAREGIVER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-03-07HouseTo Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
75554a-10Amended CodeCitation Text
75554a-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback