IL HB5042 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that resident and nonresident landowners shall complete a landowner permit application and submit proof of eligible land ownership to the Department of Natural Resources once every 5 years.
Title
HUNTING-LANDOWNER PERMIT APP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-001-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 3.1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |