IL HB5042 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any court order rescinding a statutory summary suspension or revocation must contain a factual basis for rescission. Provides that upon receipt of a court order rescinding a statutory summary suspension or revocation that does not contain a factual basis for the rescission, the Secretary of State shall return the order to the court and shall be prohibited from rescinding the statutory summary suspension until such time as the Secretary receives a court order containing a factual basis for rescission. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-COURT ORDER RESCISSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 2-118.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |