IL HB5041 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law or rule, the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts and the Department of Juvenile Justice shall permit the hiring of county juvenile detention center personnel that possess less than a bachelor's degree, including, but not limited to, the hiring of an applicant who possesses an associate's degree or has completed at least 60 credit hours at an accredited institution of higher education. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CT-DETENTION CENTER HIRING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-003-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |