IL HB5039 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation Prevention Act. Provides that it is unlawful to make available a device that makes content accessible on the Internet unless the product contains digital blocking capability that renders obscene material inaccessible. Permits the blocking capability to be deactivated. Provides a remedy if non-obscene material is blocked. Imposes a fee upon devices for which blocking capability is disabled. Permits the collection of opt-in fees for products that make Internet content available. Authorizes the Attorney General or a consumer to seek damages. Provides that fees shall be remitted to the Department of Revenue. Specifies the purposes for which, subject to appropriation, the fees may be used. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act to include this Act within the list of Acts subject to the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.
Title
BLOCK OBSCENE MATERIAL
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5039&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5039.htm |