IL HB5032 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Right to Read Act. Provides that the State Board of Education shall offer support: to each public school district to select evidence-based core reading instruction programs and implement them using structured literacy instruction; and to each early childhood, elementary, and special education teacher, reading specialist, literacy coach, and administrator to complete evidence-based training in teaching reading. Requires the State Board of Education to annually compile and post on its website information on the steps it has undertaken to support school districts to deliver high-quality, evidence-based literacy instruction, including a list of any Early Literacy Grant recipients, documentation of how the recipient allocated the funding to support improved literacy, and what evidence-based literacy curricula the recipient is utilizing. Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning educator testing, requires applicants seeking specified licenses to pass a test in reading foundations, which shall include assessment of the applicant's understanding of phonological and phonemic awareness, concepts of print and the alphabetic principle, the role of phonics in promoting reading development, word analysis skills and strategies, vocabulary development, application of reading comprehension skills and strategies, and methods for assessing reading development. In provisions concerning minimum requirements for educators trained in other states or countries, provides that an applicant who has successfully completed a reading foundations test of at least comparable rigor to the Illinois reading foundations test is not required to complete a reading foundations test. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RIGHT TO READ ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 022-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |