IL HB5031 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Repeals a provision concerning cross-agency master service agreements between State agencies and human service providers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-CROSS-AGENCY AGREEMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013051-37aRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback