IL HB5028 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0845
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that a State agency may make opioid antagonists available at a location where its employees work if the State agency trains employees in the use and administration of the opioid antagonists. Makes other changes. Amend the Good Samaritan Act. Provides that any employee of a State agency who in good faith administers an opioid antagonist shall not, as a result of her or his acts or omissions, except for willful or wanton misconduct on the part of the employee in administering the drug, be liable for civil damages. Effective January 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR-OSHA-OPIOID GUIDANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0845
2024-08-09HouseEffective Date July 1, 2025
2024-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2024-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2024-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2024-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
2024-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2024-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2024-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
2024-05-22SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2024
2024-05-22SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2024-05-21SenateWaive Posting Notice
2024-05-20SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2024-05-20SenateAssigned to State Government
2024-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2024-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2024-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2024-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2024-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2024-04-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2024-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
2024-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-04-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2024-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2024-04-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2024-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
2024-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000
2024-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
2024-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2024-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2024-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2015051505-225New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback