IL HB5020 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Diversifying Higher Education Faculty in Illinois Act. Provides that the Program Board created to administer the grant program authorized by the Act shall be comprised of 11 (rather than 21) members. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HGHER ED-DIVERSE FACULTY GRANT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0823
2018-08-13HouseEffective Date August 13, 2018
2018-08-13HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 105-002-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 105-002-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-002-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rose
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose
2018-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 008-001-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1109303Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5020&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5020.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5020eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5020enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0823.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5020sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5020sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5020sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5020_04122018_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5020_05292018_030000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5020sam003_05312018_072002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5020sam002_05312018_072001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5020sam001_05312018_072000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback