IL HB5019 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Salary and Annuity Withholding Act. Provides that an employee or annuitant may authorize the withholding of a portion of his salary, wages, or annuity, among other purposes, for investment purchases made as a participant in College Savings Programs established under the federal Internal Revenue Code. Amends the State Comptroller Act. Provides that no request for an amount to be deducted from pension annuity payments made under the Illinois Pension Code shall exceed 25% of the net amount of such payment. Provides that notice given by the Comptroller to a person upon a deduction for delinquent obligations owed to a specified government entity may inform the person that, in lieu of protest, he or she may provide written authority to the Comptroller to process the deduction immediately. Amends the Comptroller Merit Employment Code. Provides for a veteran's preference of 3 points if the person has served in the armed forces of the United States, the Illinois National Guard, or any reserve component of the armed forces of the United States, and the person, among other qualifying factors, has served a minimum of 4 years in the Illinois National Guard or reserve component of the armed forces of the United States, regardless of whether or not the person was mobilized to active duty. Amends the Illinois State Collection Act of 1986. Provides that upon processing a deduction to satisfy a debt owed to a university or a State agency, the Comptroller may provide notice informing a person that, in lieu of protest, he or she may provide written authority to the Comptroller to process the deduction immediately. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMPTROLLER-DEDUCT & VET PREF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1540510.05Amended CodeCitation Text
1540510.05dAmended CodeCitation Text
1541010b.7Amended CodeCitation Text
302105Amended CodeCitation Text
53654Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback