IL HB5018 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the Cook County Treasurer shall maintain a special fund known as the Cook County Housing Trust Fund for which the Housing Authority of Cook County shall be the sole beneficiary. Provides that the Fund may receive moneys from appropriations from the State for use by the Housing Authority of Cook County, as well as loan repayments, cash distributions from equity investments, and similar cash payments generated by a funded project that may be redeposited into the Fund and used for additional projects. Specifies the use of moneys in the Fund. Requires the Cook County Treasurer, in consultation with the Housing Authority of Cook County, to make accounting annually to the Cook County Board of Commissioners through the County Clerk of the use of moneys maintained in the Fund.
Title
COOK CTY HOUSING TRUST FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0793 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 005-002-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-039-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-02-18 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing Committee; 014-008-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Housing Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |