IL HB5016 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Removes the fingerprinting and background check requirements for a prospective qualifying patient or designated caregiver. Provides that each applicant for a registry identification card shall sign an affidavit stating that the applicant has not been convicted of violation of a state or federal controlled substance law, the Cannabis Control Act, or the Methamphetamine and Community Protection Act that was classified as a felony in the jurisdiction where the person was convicted. Provides that an applicant may sign the affidavit if the applicant was convicted of a felony under the Cannabis Control Act, but the crime that the applicant was convicted of under the Cannabis Control Act is not considered a felony at the time the affidavit is signed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL CANNABIS-FINGERPRINTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41013060Amended CodeCitation Text
41013065Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback