IL HB5014 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Removes various repeal dates of June 1, 2018 in provisions concerning allowing public building commissions to use the design-build delivery method for public projects. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLDG COMMISSION-DESIGN-BUILD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50202.5Amended CodeCitation Text
502020Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.10Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.15Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.20Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.25Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.3Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.4Amended CodeCitation Text
502020.5Amended CodeCitation Text
502023.5Amended CodeCitation Text
50203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback