IL HB5005 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0953
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services is not required to verify the State educator license of a teacher employed by the Department of Juvenile Justice if the license is verified by the State Board of Education. Provides that the provision shall become inoperative when the consent decree entered into on December 6, 2012 (as has been or may be corrected, amended, or modified in the action entitled R.J., et al. v. Mueller, case no. 12-cv-07289, in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division) is no longer in force. Amends the Department of Juvenile Justice School District Article of the School Code. Provides that the salary of a teacher employed by the Department of Juvenile Justice shall be comparable to the salary of a teacher employed by a school district in the same geographical area in which the institution or facility is located. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEPT JUV JUSTICE-TEACHERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0953
2018-08-19HouseEffective Date August 19, 2018
2018-08-19HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2018-04-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-24HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-000-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105513-43.17Amended CodeCitation Text
2041512gNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback