IL HB5000 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0991
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. In a provision concerning investigative reports issued by the Office of the Inspector General upon completion of an abuse or neglect investigation, provides that the victim and the victim's guardian shall be provided with a redacted copy of the investigative report if the allegations of abuse or neglect are substantiated. Provides that unredacted investigative reports, as well as raw data, may be shared with a local law enforcement entity, a State's Attorney's office, or a county coroner's office upon written request. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-INVESTIGATIVE REPORTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0991
2018-08-20HouseEffective Date August 20, 2018
2018-08-20HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2013051-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback