IL HB4999 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0841
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Director of Agriculture shall call annual meetings (currently, semiannual) of the Advisory Board of Livestock Commissioners and may call other meetings of the Board as deemed necessary (currently, from time to time or when requested by 3 or more appointed members of the Board). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGR-ADVISORY BOARD LIVESTOCK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0841
2018-08-14HouseEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2055-525Amended CodeCitation Text
2056.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback