IL HB4991 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to create standards and requirements with respect to vehicle staffing models that include an ambulance driver who drives an ambulance with a licensed EMT, EMT-I, A-EMT, Paramedic, or PHRN, as appropriate, in the patient compartment providing care to the patient (rather than a vehicle staffing model to allow for an alternative rural staffing model for those vehicle service providers that serve specified rural or semi-rural populations). Defines "ambulance driver".
Title
EMS SYSTEMS-AMBULANCE DRIVER
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4991&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4991.htm |