IL HB4990 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Promotion Act. Provides that grants from the Tourism Promotion Fund awarded to a unit of local government, municipal convention center, or convention center authority may be made by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity from appropriations for those purposes for any fiscal year, without regard to the fact that the qualification or obligation may have occurred in a prior fiscal year. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall submit a report on the effectiveness of the program no later than January 1, 2022 (currently, January 1, 2020). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOURISM PROMOTION-GRANTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-014-000
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
206658bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback