IL HB4990 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Promotion Act. Provides that grants from the Tourism Promotion Fund awarded to a unit of local government, municipal convention center, or convention center authority may be made by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity from appropriations for those purposes for any fiscal year, without regard to the fact that the qualification or obligation may have occurred in a prior fiscal year. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall submit a report on the effectiveness of the program no later than January 1, 2022 (currently, January 1, 2020). Effective immediately.
Title
TOURISM PROMOTION-GRANTS
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0643 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date July 27, 2018 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-014-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 665 | 8b | Amended Code | Citation Text |