IL HB4987 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a craft distiller license shall allow the sale and offering for sale at retail for use and consumption on the premises specified in the license any form of alcoholic liquor purchased from a licensed distributor or importing distributor. Provides that a craft distiller may sell up to 5,000 gallons (rather than 2,500 gallons) of spirits to non-licensees to the extent permitted by an exemption approved by the Illinois Liquor Control Commission pursuant to a specified provision. Makes a conforming change. Provides that a craft distiller tasting permit allows a craft distiller to sell and offer for sale at retail, but not for resale in any form, up to 5,000 gallons of the alcoholic liquor transferred from the craft distiller's premises to the extent approved by the State Commission pursuant to a specified provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 007-001-000
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-03-01HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback