IL HB4976 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Water Heater Safety Valve Act. Provides that a manufacturer or supplier of a hot water heater for use in a residential home or facility must supply or attach a temperature mixing valve or other safety valve to the hot water heater or tank that prevents water with a temperature above 120 degrees Fahrenheit from coming from any faucet or other source of water into direct contact with a person. Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law to provide that a person engaged in plumbing who installs a hot water heater for use in a residential home or facility must supply or attach a temperature mixing valve or other safety valve to the hot water heater or tank that prevents water with a temperature above 120 degrees Fahrenheit from coming from any bathtub faucet, shower faucet, sink faucet, or any other source of water into direct contact with a person. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
WATER HEATER SAFETY VALVE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 320 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4976&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4976.htm |