IL HB4968 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that upon motion or petition, the court shall order the sealing and impoundment of a court file for an eviction action in which the court does not find that a tenant or an occupant has materially breached the lease. Provides that the records of the circuit court clerk pertaining to a court file that is ordered sealed and impounded shall be impounded until further order of the court upon good cause shown and the name of the petitioner obliterated on the official index required to be kept by the circuit court clerk under the Clerks of Courts Act. Provides that the clerk of the court may not collect a filing fee for a petition filed under the new provisions. Makes a corresponding change in the Clerks of Courts Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EVICTIONS-SEAL COURT RECORD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-23HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70510527.2cNew CodeSee Bill Text
73559-121Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback