IL HB4966 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows the Secretary of State to issue specialty plates to motorcycles. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
SPECIALTY PLATE FOR MOTORCYCLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0843 |
2024-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-24 | House | House Concurs |
2024-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2024-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-05-21 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-05-17 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-17 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2024-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2024-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lewis |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |