IL HB4965 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for businesses with an average of 100 or fewer full-time employees during the taxable year in an amount equal to 50% of the costs incurred by the business in offering a paid family leave program to all of its full-time employees.
Title
INC TX-PAID FAMILY LEAVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4965&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4965.htm |