IL HB4965 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning the child care assistance program, provides that a family's eligibility for child care services shall be redetermined no sooner than 12 months following the initial determination or most recent redetermination. Provides that during the 12-month periods, the family shall remain eligible for child care services regardless of (i) a change in family income, unless family income exceeds 85% of State median income, or (ii) a temporary change in the ongoing status of the parents as working or attending a job training or educational program. Effective October 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD CARE SERVICE-ELIGIBILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-003-000
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30559A-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback