IL HB4964 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 4, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 4, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused, Neglected or Dependent Minors Article of the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Restricts a court from making a finding of probable cause to believe that a minor is abused or neglected based only on a parent disclosing that the parent is the victim of domestic violence and the parent is seeking or accessing services for domestic violence.
Title
JUV CT-ABUSED/NEGLECTED MINORS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 4, 2023 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-01-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 30, 2022 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 29, 2022 |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-001-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 005-001-001 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |