IL HB4964 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to place youth in care in the least restrictive and most family-like setting that is consistent with the youth's needs and best interests. Creates a private right of action for: (i) a youth in care who remains in a psychiatric hospital for more than 14 days beyond the time the youth was clinically ready for discharge or beyond medical necessity; and (ii) a youth in care who remains in a detention center or Department of Juvenile Justice facility for more than 14 days after the youth could have been released. Provides that a youth aggrieved by any violation of this provision is entitled to damages in the amount of $600 per day for each day the youth remained psychiatrically hospitalized beyond necessity or remained in a detention center or Department of Juvenile Justice facility after the youth could have been released. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall not be relieved of its liability or obligation to pay damages because the youth was placed in a shelter or in another type of placement that was not identified as an appropriate placement. Provides that the remedies are in addition to any remedies available under local, State, or federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-YOUTH IN CARE-REMEDIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2018-04-25HouseMotion Prevailed 060-048-000
2018-04-25HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-20HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-19HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-18HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2018-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205057.8New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback