IL HB4959 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Medicaid Technical Assistance Center Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish a Medicaid Technical Assistance Center (Center). Provides that the Center shall operate as a cross-system educational resource to strengthen the business infrastructure of health care provider organizations in Illinois to ultimately increase the capacity, access, and quality of Illinois' Medicaid managed care program, HealthChoice Illinois. Requires the Center to be established within the Department's Office of Medicaid Innovation. Requires the Center to collaborate with public and private partners throughout the State to identify, establish, and maintain best practices necessary for health providers to ensure their capacity to participate in HealthChoice Illinois. Requires the Center to: (i) create and administer ongoing trainings for health care providers; (ii) maintain an independent, easy to navigate, and up-to-date website that includes, but is not limited to, recorded training archives, a training calendar, and provider resources and tools; and (iii) host regional learning collaboratives that will supplement the Center's training curriculum to bring together groups of stakeholders to share issues, best practices, and escalate issues. Provides that the Department, to the extent allowable under federal law, shall maximize federal financial participation for any moneys appropriated to the Department for the Medicaid Technical Assistance Center. Provides that any federal financial participation funds obtained shall be used for the further development and expansion of the Medicaid Technical Assistance Center. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Medicaid Technical Assistance Center Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4959&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4959.htm |