IL HB4956 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, every public university in this State that offers an educator preparation program must offer to those students enrolled in the educator preparation program a 3-year degree completion program. Provides that prior to implementation of the program, a public university shall submit to the Board of Higher Education the curriculum and requirements of its program for approval. Provides that upon completion of the program, a student shall receive a bachelor's degree and qualify for entitlement for licensure. Requires the Board of Higher Education, in consultation with the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board and the State Board of Education, to adopt rules to implement the program. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TEACHERS-3-YEAR DEGREE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
2018-05-02SenatePostponed - Education
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-011-002
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-48New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback