IL HB4954 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Adds as commemorative holidays January 15 (to be known as Humanitarian Day and observed as a day of respect for the principles of human and civil rights and to involve the use of the color white as a visual affirmation to practice these principles), April 4 (to be known as Victims of Violence Wholly Day and observed as a day of respect for the principles of nonviolence and to involve the use of the color black as a visual affirmation to practice these principles), and August 28 (to be known as Dream Day and observed as a day of respect for the spiritual and moral principles of peoplehood and to involve the use of the colors black and white as a visual affirmation to practice these principles). Provides that the teaching of the history of the United States shall include the study of the American civil rights renaissance, that period of time from 1954 to 1965 called the Movement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-AMERICAN CIVIL RIGHTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2020-08-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2020-07-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2020-07-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2020-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2020-03-04HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-007-000
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2020-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-21Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback