IL HB4954 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0817
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the 4th day of November of each year is designated as "G.I. Bill of Rights Day", to be observed throughout the State as a day in recognition of the landmark legislation that provided benefits to World War II veterans, and would serve as the basis of future legislation to extend benefits to all who serve in the United States Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

G.I. BILL OF RIGHTS DAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0817
2018-08-13HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-13HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
549093New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback