IL HB4953 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall require each new applicant complete a sexual harassment training program provided by the Department and each licensee complete a sexual harassment training program provided by the Department before renewal of his or her license. Contains minimum requirements for the content of the training. Provides that the Department shall compile a report annually that summarizes the sexual harassment training program that was completed during the previous year and prescribes the plan for the training program in the coming year and includes a list of individuals who failed to complete the required training program. Requires the Department to make the report available on its website. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR-SEXUAL HARASSMNT TRAINING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0762
2018-08-10HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-10HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2021052105-15.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback