IL HB4951 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Security Deposit Return Act. Provides that for a written lease that specifies costs, the costs specified shall be for damage beyond normal wear and tear and reasonable to restore the leased premises to the same condition at the time the lease began. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SECURITY DEPOSIT-LEASE COSTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-07HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-03-07HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-02-28HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7657101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback