IL HB4950 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Removes a requirement that the Department of Human Services must report quarterly to the Governor and the General Assembly on certain expenditures under the WIC nutrition program. Amends the Capital Spending Accountability Law. Provides that reports on capital spending are due on or before the forty-fifth day after the end of each quarter (currently, the first day of each quarter). Amends the State Finance Act to eliminate a report on certain transfers. Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act to eliminate a requirement that certain survey results must be posted on an Internet website. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections concerning the DNA testing backlog. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE GOV-REPORTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 49 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1305 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3020 | 805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5k | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4-3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |