IL HB4950 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Early Mental Health and Addictions Treatment Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and other specified agencies and entities, to develop a pilot program under which a qualifying adolescent or young adult may receive community-based mental health treatment from a youth-focused community support team for early treatment that is specifically tailored to the needs of youth and young adults in the early stages of a serious emotional disturbance or serious mental illness. Requires the Department to apply, no later than September 30, 2019, for any necessary federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program. Requires the Department to implement the pilot program no later than December 31, 2019 if federal approval is not necessary. Contains provisions concerning the creation of a community-based treatment model under the pilot program; the development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Requires the Department to develop an Assertive Engagement and Community-Based Clinical Treatment Pilot Program for individuals with opioid and other drug addictions. Contains provisions on in-office, in-home, and in-community services provided under the pilot program; application for a federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program; development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY MENTAL HEALTH ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-28HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback